RI S0031 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the supported decision-making act which is a less restrictive alternative to guardianship for utilization of the probate courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supported Decision-making Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateSigned by Governor
2019-07-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-25HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/25/2019)
2019-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-17HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2019)
2019-06-14HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2019-06-13SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-06-11SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019)
2019-06-06SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-05SenateProposed Substitute
2019-05-31SenateScheduled for consideration (06/06/2019)
2019-04-11SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2019)
2019-01-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback