RI S0042 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Military Affairs - Lease Terminations For Active Duty Military (would Determine Time Frames For Termination Of Leases For Active Duty Members Of The Armed Forces.)
Title
An Act Relating To Military Affairs - Lease Terminations For Active Duty Military (would Determine Time Frames For Termination Of Leases For Active Duty Members Of The Armed Forces.)
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2013) |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2013) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2013) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |