RI S0042 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution -- Right To An Adequate Education (if Approved, Requires The State To Ensure That All Students Have The Opportunity To Achieve At High Levels, And Provide For Judicial Enforcement.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution -- Right To An Adequate Education (if Approved, Requires The State To Ensure That All Students Have The Opportunity To Achieve At High Levels, And Provide For Judicial Enforcement.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-26SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019)
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback