RI S0044 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefines extraordinary costs associated with the education of special education students to be costs that are above the core foundation amount.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0044.pdf |