RI S0046 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education -- Compulsory Attendance: would require compulsory school attendance until the age of 18 and would allow for the waiver of compulsory attendance for pupils over the age of 16 who are involved with an alternative learning plan
Title
An Act Relating To Education -- Compulsory Attendance
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Frank Devall [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. John Tassoni [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-30 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2011-06-30 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-30 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2011-06-30 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-30 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-06-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-27 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-04-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0046.pdf |