RI S0046 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Electronic Confirmation And Compliance System (would Create An Electronic Automobile And Commercial Vehicle Liability Insurance Confirmation And Compliance System In The State. Also, The Financial Penalties Would Be Increased.)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Electronic Confirmation And Compliance System (would Create An Electronic Automobile And Commercial Vehicle Liability Insurance Confirmation And Compliance System In The State. Also, The Financial Penalties Would Be Increased.)
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2013) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0046.pdf |