RI S0046 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires written notice to certain plan purchasers of rule changes.
Title
Nonprofit Dental Service Corporations
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2017) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0046.pdf |