RI S0050 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a nonprofit hospital facility converted from for-profit hospital facility would have a payment in lieu of tax agreement with the applicable city or town or subject to a municipal payment equal to sixty-five percent (65%) of the tax due.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0050.pdf |