RI S0051 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits a municipality, in which twelve percent (12%) of the housing in a municipality qualifies for low-income housing, to charge a tax up to ten percent (10%) of the current year's gross scheduled rental income.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0051.pdf |