RI S0055 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes small business development fund to encourage formation of private capital investment in underserved small businesses with annual report and termination after 6 years.
Title
Establishing A Small Business Development Fund
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/16/2019) |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2019) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |