RI S0060 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relieves Central Falls from reimbursing state for expenses related to fiscal stability act, expenses related to Central Falls school district bankruptcy proceeding, expenses of Moreau v Flanders, or expenses incurred after termination of receivership.
Title
Relating To Central Falls
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/05/2019) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0060.pdf |