RI S0061 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes cities/towns to establish a property tax credit program in exchange for volunteer service by persons over age 60 up to $1,500 calculated by multiplying service hours by the state minimum wage per hour.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0061.pdf |