RI S0072 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a vehicle unlawfully parked in a properly marked "handicapped parking" space would be towed at the owner's expense.
Title
Parking Facilities And Privileges
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/09/2019) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |