RI S0074 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts two 10 year statute of limitations on two separate tax functions.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes - Enforcement And Collection
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Judiciary |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |