RI S0076 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the probate court to deny a parent of a child who dies intestate from inheriting a share of the decedent's estate if that parent did not contribute to the child's support.
Title
Inheritance From Child By Non-supporting Parent
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0076.pdf |