RI S0093 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/10/2019)
Pending: Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Rhode Island (sessions Of General Assembly) (proposes A Constitutional Amendment Which, If Approved By The Voters, Changes The Opening Date Of The General Assembly To The First Tuesday After The First Monday In January, And Provides For Adjournment No Later Than The Friday Preceding Memorial Day.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Rhode Island (sessions Of General Assembly) (proposes A Constitutional Amendment Which, If Approved By The Voters, Changes The Opening Date Of The General Assembly To The First Tuesday After The First Monday In January, And Provides For Adjournment No Later Than The Friday Preceding Memorial Day.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (04/10/2019)
2019-04-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback