RI S0115 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides increased school housing aid for communities that utilize resident architectural firms, for the architectural services included in a new school or school renovation project.
Title
Foundation Level School Support
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Sen. James Sheehan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |