RI S0117 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the provisions of the Education Equity and Property Tax Relief Act.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0117.pdf |