RI S0119 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Domestic Relations -- Divorce And Separation: would allow that if child support has been terminated, suspended or expired the court can re-establish child support if the child has severe mental impairment or a severe impairment if the situation fits the criteria and factors in this statute
Title
An Act Relating To Domestic Relations -- Divorce And Separation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-29 | House passed as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-28 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-28 | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-28 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2011-03-01 | Senate passed as amended | |
2011-02-15 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-02-10 | Committee recommends passage as amended | |
2011-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0119.pdf |