RI S0138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Restores provisions of chapter 16.2 of title 23 as well as all of chapter 16.3 of title 23, which were repealed or deleted in the 2015 Budget Act, relating to definitions, licensing, and the operation of medical laboratories.
Title
Laboratories
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Laboratories approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2019) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |