RI S0139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends current law so that, as part of a comprehensive discharge plan, a hospital would be allowed to try to contact the patient's emergency contact and the recovery coach, in accordance with federal law.
Title
Comprehensive Discharge Planning
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-31 | House | Committee transferred to House Corporations |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/26/2019) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (02/07/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/31/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |