RI S0144 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires managed care organizations to consult with the executive office of health and human services to develop incentives for nursing facilities that demonstrate lower direct care staff turnover.
Title
Long-term Managed Care Arrangements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2019) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2019) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |