RI S0145 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires nonprofit dental service plan providers to provide notice of any changes relating to coverage to all plan purchasers purchasing dental services for employees under a group or individual policy.
Title
Nonprofit Dental Service Corporations
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0145.pdf |