RI S0147 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island Livable Home Modification Grant which allows eligible homeowners and renters to retrofit their residence to nationally recognized accessibility standards.
Title
Rhode Island Livable Home Modification Act
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/09/2019) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2019) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |