RI S0154 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes a penalty against a condominium association that fails to deliver a resale certificate within ten (10) days of a request by a unit owner.
Title
Resale Of Units
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |