RI S0159 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes law enforcement/animal control officer to hold animal confined in motor vehicle up to 72 hours pending district court hearing as to costs/fees/surrender of possession/ownership.
Title
Cruelty To Animals
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0159.pdf |