RI S0164 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Penalizes a motorist for two (2) separate violations if they are driving an unregistered motor vehicle and without insurance or proof of insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles-motor Vehicles Reparations Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2019-06-05SenateSenate read and passed
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/05/2019)
2019-05-28SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-23SenateScheduled for consideration (05/28/2019)
2019-02-26SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2019)
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback