RI S0169 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ends Rhode Island's "employment-at-will" legal doctrine, provides job protection for employees that satisfactorily perform their duties provides specific remedies for wrongful discharge.
Title
Wrongful Discharge From Employment
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0169.pdf |