RI S0171 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Ensures appropriate disability language is used in all job descriptions and statutes.
Title
Appropriate Disability Language
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-14 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-05-31 | House | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/10/2019) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |