RI S0172 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Meeting postponed (03/21/2013)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Meeting postponed (03/21/2013)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - The Rhode Island Port Marketing Collaborative Of 2013 (would Establish The Ri Port Marketing Collaborative Of 2013 To Encourage The Expansion And Development Of The State's Harbors, Ports, And Related Infrastructure.)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - The Rhode Island Port Marketing Collaborative Of 2013 (would Establish The Ri Port Marketing Collaborative Of 2013 To Encourage The Expansion And Development Of The State's Harbors, Ports, And Related Infrastructure.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/21/2013) |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Commerce |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0172.pdf |