RI S0197 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends certain sections of the education law to reference the new council on elementary and secondary education, and would make provisions to allow for certification as teachers, military personnel, and their spouses who are certified in another state.
Title
Certification Of Teachers
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0197.pdf |