RI S0198 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes and requires funding for a world language and dual language immersion program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The World Language And Dual Language Immersion Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19HouseReferred to House Finance
2019-06-18SenateSenate read and passed
2019-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2019)
2019-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for consideration (06/12/2019)
2019-03-20SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2019)
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback