RI S0199 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

2) (Limits public school K through 2 class size to twenty (20) students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing A Class Size Maximum For Kindergarten Through Grade Two

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2019)
2019-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for consideration (06/12/2019)
2019-05-01SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-26SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019)
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback