RI S0200 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Conduct A Comprehensive Review And Make Recommendations Regarding The Appropriate State Agency To House Adult Education (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Conduct A Review And Make Recommendations Regarding The Appropriate State Agency To House Adult Education From March 1, 2019, To March 3, 2020, And Would Expire On June 3, 2020.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Conduct A Comprehensive Review And Make Recommendations Regarding The Appropriate State Agency To House Adult Education (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Conduct A Review And Make Recommendations Regarding The Appropriate State Agency To House Adult Education From March 1, 2019, To March 3, 2020, And Would Expire On June 3, 2020.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019)
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback