RI S0201 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enables the town of Coventry to charge owners of lands using the sewage works interest charges in excess of charges paid by the town.
Title
Relating To Coventry Sewer Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-05-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2019) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Meeting postponed (02/27/2019) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |