RI S0215 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows individuals otherwise certified to practice acupuncture and Chinese medicine using Chinese medical diagnostic methods.
Title
The Healing Art Of Acupuncture And Oriental Medicine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/23/2019) |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |