RI S0217 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides greater details to be considered when deciding if there has been substantial compliance with the statutes requiring the prompt processing and payment of health insurance claims.
Title
Prompt Processing Of Claims
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |