RI S0220 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Meeting postponed (06/06/2019)
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Tax credit for opportunity zone in investment in Pawtucket

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pawtucket Opportunity Zone Income Tax Credit Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateMeeting postponed (06/06/2019)
2019-05-31SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-03-07SenateMeeting postponed (03/07/2019)
2019-03-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback