RI S0223 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island program to address Alzheimer's disease and would also create a thirteen (13) member advisory council. This act would also establish a training requirement for medical professionals.
Title
Establishing A Program Within The Department Of Health To Address Alzheimer's Disease
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |