RI S0225 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands family court jurisdiction to enter protective orders to provide for the safety and welfare of household pets in domestic abuse situations.
Title
Domestic Abuse Prevention
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |