RI S0238 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes $250 substance abuse education assessment for conviction of driving under the influence or a violation for refusal to submit to a breathalyzer. Funds would be allocated to BHDDH and used to fund substance abuse programs.
Title
Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles-motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |