RI S0239 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the compensation of direct-care staff of nursing facilities as a result of the application of the inflation index.
Title
Medical Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/13/2019) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0239.pdf |