RI S0251 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Extends requirement to collect sales tax to remote sellers in a way that conforms to a recent U.S. Supreme Court decision making it easier for states to compel collection of the sales tax from retailers who do not have a physical presence in their state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales And Use Tax--non-collecting Retailers, Referrers, And Retail Sale Facilitators Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by Governor
2019-03-28SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-03-26HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-03-22HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/26/2019)
2019-03-21HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2019-03-15HouseScheduled for consideration (03/21/2019)
2019-03-13HouseReferred to House Finance
2019-03-12SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (03/12/2019)
2019-03-05SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-03-01SenateProposed Substitute
2019-03-01SenateScheduled for consideration (03/05/2019)
2019-02-26SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2019)
2019-02-12SenateMeeting postponed (02/12/2019)
2019-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback