RI S0255 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the 10 year period within which time the secretary of state's office is authorized to withdraw a certificate of revocation for all Rhode Island business corporations, foreign corporations, nonprofit corporations and limited liability companies.
Title
Rhode Island Business Corporations Act - Nonprofit Corporation Act - Limited-liability Company Act
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0255.pdf |