RI S0262 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the condition that there needs to be a reasonable expectation that a 19 year old will complete a program in secondary school in order to qualify as a dependent child.
Title
The Rhode Island Works Program
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |