RI S0263 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires charter public schools include on their board of governors or trustees, one member from host community to be appointed by the school committee of said community.
Title
Establishment Of Charter Public Schools
Sponsors
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |