RI S0266 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Establishing An Office Of Inspector General (would Establish The Office Of Inspector General As An Independent Administrative Agency Charged With The Purpose Of Preventing And Detecting Fraud, Waste And Abuse, And Mismanagement In The Expenditure Of Public Funds.)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Establishing An Office Of Inspector General (would Establish The Office Of Inspector General As An Independent Administrative Agency Charged With The Purpose Of Preventing And Detecting Fraud, Waste And Abuse, And Mismanagement In The Expenditure Of Public Funds.)
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] |
Sen. Dawson Hodgson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2013) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0266.pdf |