RI S0266 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-02 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-02 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the participation and input of the EOHHS, DHS, DCYF and BDHDDH in medical assistance and public assistance caseload estimating conferences and the generation of monthly data to the members of the caseload estimating conference.
Title
Medical Assistance And Public Assistance Caseload Estimating Conferences
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Senate - Public finance (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2017) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2017) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/14/2017) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |