RI S0267 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Includes licensed school psychologists under the provisions of the general laws governing the regulations of psychologists, and limits the authorization of school psychologist to practice school psychology to the school setting.
Title
Psychologists
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |