RI S0270 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the number of water quality fund classes from three to two.
Title
Drinking Water Supply System Protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0270.pdf |